Trustees EPPING FOREST COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1148539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD BASSETT Chair 27 March 2019
None on record
DAVID JACKMAN Trustee 21 January 2021
THE ONGAR CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED
Received: On time
AFFORDABLE COUNSELLING EPPING FOREST
Received: On time
Matthew Neil Patterson Trustee 13 December 2018
None on record
Paul Ashworth Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record
Roy Fredderick Coombs Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record