ARC TRUST

Charity number: 1147475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 07 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 31 May 2018 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required