Trustees COMMUNITIES FIRST WESSEX
Charity number: 1147527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEVERLEY JONES | Chair | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Yinnon Ezra MBE MA FRSA | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lefley | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES ELEY | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Frederick Kirkland | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Graham | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denis Gibson | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER OWENS | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.