ST JUDE'S PTA

Charity number: 1147566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 20/07/2016 20/07/2017 20/07/2018 20/07/2019 20/07/2020
Total gross income £8.02k £10.12k £15.72k £13.09k £4.14k
Total expenditure £7.78k £4.27k £19.64k £11.96k £1.67k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A