MANGO TREE GOA

Charity number: 1148049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £88.54k £88.14k £133.61k £91.92k £100.09k
Total expenditure £30.13k £30.32k £45.06k £245.26k £155.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A