Accounts and annual returns FINISH WELL

Charity number: 1148233
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Annual return 06 April 2022 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2021 23 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2020 25 June 2021 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2019 25 June 2021 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 Not Required