BOOTHSTOWN VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1149169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 20 October 2016 On time Download