BOOTHSTOWN VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1149169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £29.22k £61.80k £63.90k £37.67k £25.85k
Total expenditure £22.00k £51.75k £73.14k £37.84k £33.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £952 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £29.79k £29.80k N/A N/A