AL-MADINA INTERNATIONAL ISLAMIC INSTITUTION SYLHET

Charity number: 1149207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £14.27k £37.76k £40.32k £33.49k £40.46k
Total expenditure £21.88k £31.62k £30.92k £32.25k £33.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A