Financial history COMMUNITY FOOTBALL ACADEMY (CFA)

Charity number: 1149497
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £22.81k £23.52k £24.59k £24.95k £24.12k
Total expenditure £25.21k £25.82k £25.12k £26.21k £23.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A