Trustees UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1148683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Brooker | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Odek | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Robertson | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Moir | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marina Stasi | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Would | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Sunderland | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Bastable | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bhupinder siran | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Anderson | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.