WEYMOUTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download