MACCABI LONDON BRADY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 July 2019 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 July 2019 65 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download