Financial history THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL SERVICES

Charity number: 1149326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.19m £7.18m £7.93m £9.52m £17.07m
Total expenditure £7.17m £7.18m £7.60m £8.06m £14.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £752.96k £547.87k £694.61k £1.92m £3.37m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.35m £6.55m £7.17m £7.44m £13.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71.97k £76.57k £60.27k £56.17k £54.89k
Income - Other £14.20k £10.12k £6.03k £99.73k £275.73k
Income - Legacies £35.20k £0 £0 £2.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.17m £7.18m £7.60m £8.06m £14.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.08k
Expenditure - Governance £39.33k £40.63k £36.63k £41.34k £63.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0