Trustees THE DAUGHTERS OF CHARITY OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL SERVICES
Charity number: 1149326

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Rowe | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathleen Hogg | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
James O'Connor | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Barbara Quilty | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Sarah King-Turner | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Theresa Tighe Sr | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||
SISTER MOIRA THERESA BAIN | Trustee | 04 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Paul ROCHE | Trustee | 02 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Sister Ellen Teresa Flynn DC | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.