MERTHYR CYNON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1149296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £32.60k £34.95k £99.04k £48.93k £74.17k
Total expenditure £35.48k £35.33k £35.50k £36.31k £60.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A