Accounts and annual returns VIDYANANDA COLLEGE OLD STUDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1154539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 16 December 2021 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 04 September 2020 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required