B SHARP LTD

Charity number: 1149237
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £128.28k £200.26k £86.43k £115.24k £95.16k
Total expenditure £105.39k £139.73k £119.48k £104.17k £95.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.64k £35.09k £12.50k £6.50k £10.00k