Financial history QUROSA UK AND IRELAND BRANCH

Charity number: 1163130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £10.60k £6.72k £14.25k £990 £0
Total expenditure £12.86k £5.36k £6.59k £955 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A