REFUGEE AND MIGRANT NETWORK SUTTON

Charity number: 1150500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.15k £26.41k £37.92k £67.28k £64.65k
Total expenditure £32.09k £28.59k £34.85k £42.39k £52.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.62k £5.34k N/A £3.75k £3.62k