Dogfen lywodraethu DERBY MUSEUMS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JAN 2017 as amended on 29 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND/OR MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND/OR ART GALLERY; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC AND/OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE ABOVE, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF DERBY'S ENGINEERING AND CREATIVE HERITAGE; 4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 5) PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
DERBY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.