ST.NEOTS EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1150478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £237.22k £247.74k £156.03k £178.67k £188.72k
Total expenditure £207.53k £319.53k £155.23k £187.37k £192.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A