Financial history MISSION D'EVANGELISATION POUR LE SALUT INTEGRAL (M.E.S.I)

Charity number: 1149362
Charity reporting is overdue by 718 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/12/2014 19/12/2015 19/12/2016 19/12/2017 19/12/2018
Total gross income £5.47k £3.62k £4.50k £2.72k £4.37k
Total expenditure £3.60k £3.60k £4.08k £3.07k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A