ST STEPHENS PRE-SCHOOL (COLCHESTER)

Charity number: 1149154
Charity reporting is overdue by 791 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 60 days
Annual return 27 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 425 days
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 425 days
Annual return 27 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 791 days
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 791 days
Annual return 27 September 2017 15 October 2018 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2017 15 October 2018 80 days late Download
Annual return 27 September 2016 20 February 2018 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2016 20 February 2018 208 days late Download