ST STEPHENS PRE-SCHOOL (COLCHESTER)

Charity number: 1149154
Charity reporting is overdue by 789 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2013 30/09/2014 29/09/2015 27/09/2016 27/09/2017
Total gross income £65.25k £94.84k £105.92k £108.11k £119.70k
Total expenditure £66.56k £80.49k £89.05k £91.47k £130.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £91.10k £106.95k £119.46k