THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SPROWSTON WITH BEESTON ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1149140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £152.39k £131.58k £152.94k £158.84k £159.42k
Total expenditure £148.27k £128.31k £150.04k £164.18k £173.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £400