ALBION STREET COMMUNITY CHARITY LTD

Charity number: 1153318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 14 March 2017 On time Download