Accounts and annual returns TOGETHER NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1150824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window