Trustees TOGETHER NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1150824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Wild Trustee 13 April 2022
None on record
Rev Catherine Annunciata Macpherson Trustee 13 April 2022
None on record
Rev'd Dr Pauline Hilary Pearson Trustee 17 April 2019
NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN EDUCATION BOARD
Received: On time
Ven. Mark Wroe Trustee 17 April 2019
CHARITY OF BISHOP CHANDLER (NEWCASTLE BRANCH)
Received: On time
Gwyn McKenzie Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
Eric Jubb Trustee 25 January 2017
HEART OF THE CITY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Professor John Burgess Goddard Trustee 29 January 2013
TYNE AMATEUR ROWING CLUB
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time