Accounts and annual returns MILL END BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1149363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 19 October 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 25 October 2019 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 25 October 2019 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 02 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 02 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window