Financial history MILL END BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1149363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £168.06k £142.00k £139.00k £125.74k £146.60k
Total expenditure £176.11k £154.00k £138.00k £115.47k £134.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A