Accounts and annual returns ONCA TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1150539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 October 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 October 2020 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 11 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window