Financial history ONCA TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1150539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £117.06k £130.21k £162.34k £205.56k £246.05k
Total expenditure £126.37k £142.65k £173.52k £161.65k £200.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £5.00k £38.06k £96.30k