Trustees ONCA TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1150539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Jane Zajicek Coleman Chair 22 September 2017
None on record
Jennifer Uchendu Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Aidan Evans-Jesra Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Syra Tariq Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Dr Vinita Damodaran Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Clare Whistler Trustee 03 February 2017
None on record
Dr Julie Doyle Trustee 12 February 2015
None on record
Michelle Westbury Trustee 07 January 2014
WHOOPSADAISY BRIGHTON
Received: On time
Dr Eva Maria Zajicek Coleman Trustee 15 October 2012
None on record