Register of Charities - The Charity Commission TAMU PYE LHU SANGH UK
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tamu Pye Lhu Sangh UK had organised the events as follows and managed to raise the funds for TPLSUK. 1. 2x Gurung films - shown in Empire hall on 23 Mar and 20 Apr 2019. 2. TPLSUK's AGM held on 30 Mar 2019. 3. Summer BBQ Party held on 27 Jul 2019 in Feltham Community College. 4. LM Charity Dinner Party held on 02 Nov 2019 in Empire Hall. 5. Lhosar held on 31 Dec 2019 - Harrow leisure centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People
11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.