Financial history REACH FOR A STAR

Charity number: 1149735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £14.43k £20.15k £21.06k £10.27k £12.23k
Total expenditure £20.14k £17.58k £11.77k £9.60k £15.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k