Financial history COVENTRY IRISH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1150290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.54k £107.25k £124.09k £79.45k £95.80k
Total expenditure £68.98k £106.50k £113.54k £87.60k £90.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A