BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION CARDIFF LTD

Charity number: 1150213
Charity reporting is overdue by 232 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 01/08/2016 01/08/2017 01/08/2018 01/08/2019
Total gross income £10.21k £9.16k £15.34k £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.35k £17.98k £12.43k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A