Financial history 15TH WHITLEY BAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.49k £9.38k £12.46k £12.41k £23.94k
Total expenditure £10.89k £7.73k £13.69k £12.46k £6.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.72k