YOUR MONEY COUNTS

Charity number: 1154512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.68k £8.98k £7.50k £6.63k £837
Total expenditure £16.02k £9.94k £8.62k £7.89k £1.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A