Accounts and annual returns ST PAUL'S NEW COVENANT CHURCH

Charity number: 1149899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window