ST PAUL'S NEW COVENANT CHURCH

Charity number: 1149899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £55.39k £57.18k £50.09k £43.39k £53.64k
Total expenditure £50.66k £54.90k £51.88k £45.34k £48.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A