Financial history BRASS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1149863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £239.26k £209.94k £308.22k £389.54k £567.59k
Total expenditure £210.25k £195.05k £267.46k £426.11k £315.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £565.78k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.81k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £234.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £80.79k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £25.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0