Financial history BTWENTYSEVEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150431
Charity reporting is overdue by 947 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018
Total gross income £0 £7.08k £21.64k £19.69k £15.88k
Total expenditure £1.66k £15.50k £19.78k £26.34k £16.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A