ARUNDEL CASTLE CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £250.12k £235.34k £451.42k £558.73k £380.12k
Total expenditure £288.20k £312.48k £328.20k £339.86k £260.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £34.47k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £498.74k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £30.73k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £29.26k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £62.85k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £318.20k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £21.66k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £8.09k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A