ARUNDEL CASTLE CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL ANDREW ATHERTON OBE Trustee 11 December 2012 None on record
JOCELYN MARIE GALSWORTHY Trustee 11 December 2012 None on record
Caroline Nicholls Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
ARFAN AKRAM Trustee 11 December 2012 None on record
NIGEL GORDON HELM DRAFFAN Trustee 11 December 2012
NECHILIBI APPEAL Received: On time
PETWORTH HOUSE TENNIS COURT LIMITED Received: On time
THOMAS ALAN BRISTOWE Trustee 11 December 2012 None on record
Robert Bruce Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Henry Jonathan Pelham Chetwood Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
Gerald Peter Bristowe Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
RICHARD A PYMAN Trustee 19 May 2013 None on record
Mark Milliken - Smith Trustee 22 March 2019 None on record
JUDY MARTIN-JENKINS Trustee 07 November 2013 None on record
Amanda Jane Jupp Trustee 23 March 2018
CHICHESTER HARBOUR TRUST Received: On time