THE TRIORCA TRUST

Charity number: 1150633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.95k £12.97k £24.29k £49.16k £3.10k
Total expenditure £1.92k £33.05k £24.91k £42.57k £10
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £0 £7.50k £7.50k N/A