Trustees THE NATIONAL FUNDING SCHEME

Charity number: 1149800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Georgina Bagshawe Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Sam Cooper Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Jun Park Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
JAMIE GALLOWAY Trustee 22 June 2016
None on record
WILLIAM MAKOWER Trustee 07 November 2012
THE MAKOWER PRIZE FUND
Received: On time