Trustees NIWE EATING DISTRESS SERVICE TRADING AS EATING DISTRESS NORTH EAST

Charity number: 1150416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYN BOYLE Chair 23 December 2012
None on record
Radha Sharma Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
Michael Moncrieff Wallace Trustee 26 November 2018
THE NORTHUMBRIA REGION U3A
Received: On time
Lauren Patterson Trustee 13 August 2018
OUSEBURN FARM CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
Michael Garry Trustee 18 June 2018
None on record