CRANSLEY HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 1151018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.10m £1.56m £1.15m £1.25m £1.34m
Total expenditure £541.77k £1.13m £1.16m £1.31m £1.42m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £802.11k £1.08m £586.18k £395.42k £694.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £183.11k £174.79k
Income - Charitable activities £269.07k £437.39k £520.65k £639.00k £427.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.89k £37.37k £39.06k £35.73k £42.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £274.58k £648.98k £173.03k £282.77k £262.04k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £167.35k £689.64k £695.04k £762.58k £841.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £374.42k £443.51k £467.14k £544.56k £573.80k
Expenditure - Governance £4.05k £5.50k £4.75k £25.08k £14.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0